U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00267-1
  • Case Name: USA v. ROBINSON
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 22, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • December 20, 2022: [Continue ]
October, 2022
  • October 20, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • October 20, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • October 03, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 03, 2022: [Status Report]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 31, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • August 31, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • August 31, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • August 23, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
  • August 23, 2022: [Protective Order ]
  • August 19, 2022: [Protective Order ]
  • August 18, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • August 17, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 17, 2022: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • August 17, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 17, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • August 17, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • August 17, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • August 17, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 17, 2022: [Speedy Trial ]
  • August 16, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • August 15, 2022: [.Order]
  • August 10, 2022: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.