U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00269-1
  • Case Name: USA v. BAILEY
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 16, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 16, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
October, 2022
  • October 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • October 07, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 05, 2022: [Continue ]
September, 2022
  • September 21, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • September 12, 2022: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
August, 2022
  • August 22, 2022: [.Order]
  • August 22, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
  • August 22, 2022: [Order on Motion to Commit Defendant to Custody of Attorney General]
  • August 22, 2022: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody ]
  • August 22, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • August 22, 2022: [Commit Defendant to Custody of Attorney General]
  • August 22, 2022: [Release from Custody ]
  • August 22, 2022: [Protective Order ]
  • August 19, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • August 19, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • August 19, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 18, 2022: [Continue ]
  • August 16, 2022: [.Order]
  • August 16, 2022: [Continue ]
  • August 16, 2022: [Order on Motion for Temporary Detention]
  • August 16, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • August 16, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 16, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 16, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • August 16, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • August 16, 2022: [Temporary Detention ]
  • August 16, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • August 16, 2022: [Memorandum in Support of Pretrial Detention]
  • August 15, 2022: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • August 15, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • August 15, 2022: [.Order]
  • August 15, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 10, 2022: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.