U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-mc-00075
  • Case Name: In re: MINTZ, LEVIN, COHEN, FERRIS, GLOVSKY & POPEO, P.C.
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Receipt and Acknowledgment of Transfer Papers]
  • October 24, 2022: [Case Transferred Out]
  • October 17, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • October 17, 2022: [.Order]
September, 2022
  • September 24, 2022: [Reply to opposition to motion]
  • September 22, 2022: [Response to (non-motion) Document]
  • September 16, 2022: [Compel]
  • September 14, 2022: [Response to motion]
  • September 12, 2022: [Declaration]
  • September 12, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear ]
  • September 09, 2022: [Appear]
  • September 09, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • September 01, 2022: [.Order]
  • September 01, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • September 01, 2022: [Declaration]
August, 2022
  • August 30, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • August 30, 2022: [Case Referred to Magistrate Judge]
  • August 25, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • August 19, 2022: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • August 19, 2022: [Filing Fee Received]
  • August 12, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • August 10, 2022: [Order]
  • August 09, 2022: [Memorandum]
  • August 09, 2022: [Quash]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.