U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00268-1
  • Case Name: USA v. THOMAS
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 11, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Case]
  • October 11, 2022: [Dismiss Case]
August, 2022
  • August 30, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions for High Intensity Supervision Program]
  • August 30, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • August 30, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 30, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
  • August 29, 2022: [Bond Hearing]
  • August 29, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 29, 2022: [Protective Order ]
  • August 24, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • August 17, 2022: [Response to motion]
  • August 15, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 12, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 12, 2022: [Stay]
  • August 12, 2022: [Review]
  • August 11, 2022: [.Order]
  • August 11, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions for High Intensity Supervision Program]
  • August 11, 2022: [Order on Motion for Placement in High Intensity Supervision Program]
  • August 11, 2022: [Order on Motion to Commit Defendant to Custody of Attorney General]
  • August 11, 2022: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • August 11, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • August 11, 2022: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • August 11, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • August 11, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • August 11, 2022: [Speedy Trial ]
  • August 11, 2022: [Stay]
  • August 11, 2022: [Placement in High Intensity Supervision Program]
  • August 11, 2022: [Commit Defendant to Custody of Attorney General]
  • August 10, 2022: [Indictment]
  • August 10, 2022: [Response to (non-motion) Document]
  • August 09, 2022: [Memorandum in Support of Pretrial Detention]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.