U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-mj-00179-1
  • Case Name: USA v. CHILCOAT et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 13, 2022: [Terminate Merged Defendant]
  • September 06, 2022: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • September 06, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • September 06, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Exclude]
  • August 30, 2022: [Continue ]
  • August 26, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • August 25, 2022: [Rule 5 (c)(3) Documents Received]
  • August 24, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • August 24, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 24, 2022: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • August 24, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 24, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • August 24, 2022: [Speedy Trial ]
  • August 22, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • August 22, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 22, 2022: [.Order]
  • August 19, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • August 19, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 19, 2022: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • August 19, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 19, 2022: [Speedy Trial ]
  • August 19, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • August 18, 2022: [Rule 5 (c)(3) Documents Received]
  • August 18, 2022: [Notice of Error]
  • August 18, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 17, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 16, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 16, 2022: [.Order]
  • August 11, 2022: [Case Unsealed]
  • August 11, 2022: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • August 11, 2022: [Arrest - Other District ]
  • August 11, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal Case]
  • August 11, 2022: [Seal Case]
  • August 11, 2022: [Complaint (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.