U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00271-1
  • Case Name: USA v. WASHINGTON
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 06, 2023: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 03, 2023: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
December, 2022
  • December 22, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • December 22, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • December 13, 2022: [Continue ]
  • December 05, 2022: [Exclude]
November, 2022
  • November 10, 2022: [Continue ]
October, 2022
  • October 11, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • October 11, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 07, 2022: [Continue ]
September, 2022
  • September 27, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
August, 2022
  • August 18, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 17, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
  • August 16, 2022: [Protective Order ]
  • August 16, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • August 16, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • August 16, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • August 16, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • August 16, 2022: [.Order]
  • August 16, 2022: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • August 15, 2022: [Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance by Assistant U.S. Attorney]
  • August 12, 2022: [.Order]
  • August 12, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 12, 2022: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.