U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00273-1
  • Case Name: USA v. BORDERS
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 30, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • December 29, 2022: [Continue ]
  • December 15, 2022: [Transcript]
  • December 13, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
October, 2022
  • October 03, 2022: [Waiver of Trial by Jury]
  • October 03, 2022: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • October 03, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
September, 2022
  • September 29, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • September 29, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • September 29, 2022: [Statement of Offense]
  • September 29, 2022: [Plea Agreement Hearing]
  • September 29, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • September 27, 2022: [Order for Routine Processing]
August, 2022
  • August 30, 2022: [.Order]
  • August 30, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 12, 2022: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.