U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00164-1
  • Case Name: USA v. SEALED
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 19, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • August 19, 2022: [.Order]
  • August 18, 2022: [.Order]
  • August 18, 2022: [Order]
  • August 17, 2022: [Motion Hearing]
  • August 17, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • August 17, 2022: [.Order]
  • August 17, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 16, 2022: [Response to motion]
  • August 16, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 16, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • August 16, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 16, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • August 16, 2022: [Notice of Error]
  • August 15, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 15, 2022: [Response to motion]
  • August 15, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 14, 2022: [Memorandum in Opposition]
  • August 12, 2022: [Bond ]
  • August 12, 2022: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.