U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00272-1
  • Case Name: USA v. WHITTAKER
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 23, 2023: [Certificate of Service ]
  • January 17, 2023: [Certificate of Service ]
  • January 12, 2023: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Case]
December, 2022
  • December 19, 2022: [Reply in Support]
  • December 19, 2022: [Response to motion]
  • December 09, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • December 09, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • December 08, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • December 07, 2022: [Memorandum in Opposition]
November, 2022
  • November 10, 2022: [Dismiss Case]
  • November 10, 2022: [Suppress]
October, 2022
  • October 24, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 14, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
September, 2022
  • September 19, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
  • September 19, 2022: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • September 18, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 16, 2022: [Notice of Error]
  • September 16, 2022: [Protective Order ]
  • September 15, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 15, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • September 15, 2022: [Memorandum in Opposition]
  • September 14, 2022: [Order]
August, 2022
  • August 25, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • August 25, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • August 25, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • August 22, 2022: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • August 18, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • August 17, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 16, 2022: [Attorney Appearance Pro Bono]
  • August 15, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • August 15, 2022: [.Order]
  • August 15, 2022: [Indictment]
  • August 15, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • August 15, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.