U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-mj-00177-1
  • Case Name: USA v. LAMOTTA
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 27, 2022: [Terminate Merged Defendant]
  • September 06, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • September 01, 2022: [Protective Order ]
  • September 01, 2022: [Order]
August, 2022
  • August 26, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • August 24, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • August 24, 2022: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • August 24, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 24, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 24, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • August 24, 2022: [Speedy Trial ]
  • August 22, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 22, 2022: [.Order]
  • August 16, 2022: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • August 16, 2022: [Case Unsealed]
  • August 16, 2022: [Arrest - Other District ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.