U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00276-1
  • Case Name: USA v. IRVING
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 23, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • January 22, 2023: [Dismiss Case]
December, 2022
  • December 08, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
October, 2022
  • October 17, 2022: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • October 06, 2022: [.Order]
  • October 01, 2022: [Memorandum in Opposition]
September, 2022
  • September 19, 2022: [Standing Order]
  • September 13, 2022: [Suppress]
  • September 06, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
August, 2022
  • August 23, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 19, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • August 19, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 19, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • August 19, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • August 18, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 17, 2022: [.Order]
  • August 17, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • August 17, 2022: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.