U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 22-00142
  • Case Name: Michael Kevin Payne-Owens
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 15, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Order To Close Case & Discharge Trustee - Ch 7 No Asset (Discharged)]
  • December 15, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Close Bankruptcy Case]
November, 2022
  • November 24, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • November 22, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Order Discharging Debtor(s)]
  • November 10, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • November 08, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Order for Relief]
October, 2022
  • October 20, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card (ADI)]
  • October 19, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Opportunity to Object (Correction)]
  • October 19, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Hearing (Original or Amended)]
  • October 19, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Relief from Stay]
  • October 14, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Trustee Services Rendered Pursuant to 330(e)]
  • October 14, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution]
  • October 14, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [First Meeting of Creditors Held]
  • October 13, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Amended Voluntary Petition]
September, 2022
  • September 24, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - First Meeting of Creditors]
  • September 22, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [First Meeting of Creditors - Notice Sent to BNC]
  • September 22, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [First Meeting of Creditors AMENDED -Notice Sent to BNC]
  • September 22, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Appointing Successor Trustee]
  • September 20, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Dismiss/Strike/Withdraw Document]
  • September 20, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Certification About A Financial Management Course (Original or Amended)]
  • September 19, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Resignation of Interim Trustee]
  • September 07, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card (ADI)]
  • September 07, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Relief from Stay]
August, 2022
  • August 25, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Notice of Appearance (Add Party to Matrix)]
  • August 21, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - First Meeting of Creditors]
  • August 21, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • August 19, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor (Original or Amended)]
  • August 19, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Deficiency Letter - Pleading(s)/Document(s)]
  • August 19, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Notice Of Requirement To File Certification About A Financial Management Course (Ch 7)]
  • August 18, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [First Meeting of Creditors - Notice Sent to BNC]
  • August 17, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [First Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
  • August 17, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Employee Income Records / Payment Advices (Original or Amended)]
  • August 17, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Employee Income Records / Payment Advices (Original or Amended)]
  • August 17, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Certificate of Credit Counseling (Original or Amended)]
  • August 17, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling (Original or Amended)]
  • August 17, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card (ADI)]
  • August 17, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Auto-Docket of Credit Card (ADI)]
  • August 17, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • August 17, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Statement of Your Social Security Numbers - Form 121 (Original or Amended)]
  • August 17, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Chapter 7 Statements - Monthly Income (122A-1) / Exemption Presumption of Abuse (122A-1Supp)]
  • August 17, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • August 17, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Statement of Your Social Security Numbers - Form 121 (Original or Amended)]
  • August 17, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Chapter 7 Statements - Monthly Income (122A-1) / Exemption Presumption of Abuse (122A-1Supp)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.