U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00279-1
  • Case Name: USA v. SANTIFER
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 20, 2023: [Notice of Error]
  • January 20, 2023: [Response to (non-motion) Document]
December, 2022
  • December 02, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 01, 2022: [.Order]
October, 2022
  • October 13, 2022: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • October 13, 2022: [Statement of Offense]
  • October 13, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • October 03, 2022: [Plea Agreement Hearing]
  • October 03, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
September, 2022
  • September 09, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • September 09, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
August, 2022
  • August 24, 2022: [.Order]
  • August 18, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • August 17, 2022: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.