U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00277-1
  • Case Name: USA v. WILLIAMS
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 21, 2022: [Statement of Reasons (DO NOT UNSEAL)]
  • November 21, 2022: [Judgment]
  • November 02, 2022: [Sentencing]
October, 2022
  • October 05, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • October 04, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
September, 2022
  • September 09, 2022: [Statement of Offense]
  • September 09, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • September 09, 2022: [Waiver of Trial by Jury]
  • September 09, 2022: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • September 09, 2022: [Plea Agreement Hearing]
  • September 09, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • September 09, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • September 09, 2022: [Referred for PSI Report]
August, 2022
  • August 23, 2022: [Scheduling Conference]
  • August 23, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 19, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • August 19, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 17, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 17, 2022: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.