U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00280-1
  • Case Name: USA v. ROSSMAN
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 12, 2022: [Statement of Reasons (DO NOT UNSEAL)]
  • December 12, 2022: [Judgment]
  • December 09, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • December 07, 2022: [Supplement to any document]
  • December 05, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • December 02, 2022: [Supplement to any document]
November, 2022
  • November 25, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • November 22, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • November 09, 2022: [Notice of Error]
  • November 08, 2022: [Response to (non-motion) Document]
  • November 07, 2022: [Response to (non-motion) Document]
  • November 04, 2022: [Response to (non-motion) Document]
October, 2022
  • October 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 06, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
September, 2022
  • September 09, 2022: [Waiver of Trial by Jury]
  • September 09, 2022: [Statement of Offense]
  • September 09, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • September 09, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • September 09, 2022: [Plea Agreement Hearing]
  • September 09, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 09, 2022: [Referred for PSI Report]
  • September 09, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • September 07, 2022: [Response to Order of the Court]
August, 2022
  • August 30, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • August 22, 2022: [.Order]
  • August 19, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • August 19, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 18, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • August 18, 2022: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.