U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 22-00143-
  • Case Name: Amy M Mayers
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 06, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Order To Close Case & Discharge Trustee - Ch 7 No Asset (Discharged)]
  • December 06, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Close Bankruptcy Case]
November, 2022
  • November 24, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • November 22, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Order Discharging Debtor(s)]
September, 2022
  • September 22, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [First Meeting of Creditors Held]
  • September 22, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution]
August, 2022
  • August 21, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - First Meeting of Creditors]
  • August 19, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [First Meeting of Creditors - Notice Sent to BNC]
  • August 19, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Employee Income Records / Payment Advices (Original or Amended)]
  • August 19, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Chapter 7 Statements - Monthly Income (122A-1) / Exemption Presumption of Abuse (122A-1Supp)]
  • August 19, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Statement of Intent (Original or Amended)]
  • August 19, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Statement of Financial Affairs (Original or Amended)]
  • August 19, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Declaration About Individual Debtor's Schedules - Form 106Dec]
  • August 19, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Summary Assets and Liabilities]
  • August 19, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Schedules A/B-J]
  • August 19, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [List of Creditors and Mailing Matrix]
  • August 19, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Certificate of Credit Counseling (Original or Amended)]
  • August 19, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Statement of Your Social Security Numbers - Form 121 (Original or Amended)]
  • August 19, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Receipt of Filing Fee (OTC auto)]
  • August 19, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Personal Financial Managment Course]
  • August 18, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • August 18, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [First Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.