U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 22-00144-
  • Case Name: Phil Brownlee Smith
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 15, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Close Bankruptcy Case]
  • December 15, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Order To Close Case - Ch 11 (Dismissed)]
September, 2022
  • September 09, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • September 07, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Order]
  • September 07, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Order Dismiss Case]
  • September 07, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Hearing - Held (BK)]
  • September 06, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Response]
August, 2022
  • August 25, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - First Meeting of Creditors]
  • August 23, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [First Meeting of Creditors - Notice Sent to BNC]
  • August 23, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [First Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11]
  • August 20, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • August 19, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Appearance (Add Party to Matrix)]
  • August 19, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
  • August 18, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Order To Show Cause]
  • August 18, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Deficiency Letter - Case Opening]
  • August 18, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Statement of Financial Affairs (Original or Amended)]
  • August 18, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Employee Income Records / Payment Advices (Original or Amended)]
  • August 18, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [List of Creditors and Mailing Matrix]
  • August 18, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Application to Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
  • August 18, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Statement of Your Social Security Numbers - Form 121 (Original or Amended)]
  • August 18, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.