U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 22-00145
  • Case Name: Ritza Ferrufino
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 06, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Order To Close Case & Discharge Trustee - Ch 7 No Asset (Discharged)]
  • December 06, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Close Bankruptcy Case]
November, 2022
  • November 24, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • November 22, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Order Discharging Debtor(s)]
September, 2022
  • September 22, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [First Meeting of Creditors Held]
  • September 22, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution]
August, 2022
  • August 21, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - First Meeting of Creditors]
  • August 21, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • August 19, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Notice Of Requirement To File Certification About A Financial Management Course (Ch 7)]
  • August 19, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [First Meeting of Creditors - Notice Sent to BNC]
  • August 18, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [First Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
  • August 18, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor (Original or Amended)]
  • August 18, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor (Original or Amended)]
  • August 18, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Chapter 7 Statements - Monthly Income (122A-1) / Exemption Presumption of Abuse (122A-1Supp)]
  • August 18, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Chapter 7 Statements - Monthly Income (122A-1) / Exemption Presumption of Abuse (122A-1Supp)]
  • August 18, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Statement of Your Social Security Numbers - Form 121 (Original or Amended)]
  • August 18, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Statement of Your Social Security Numbers - Form 121 (Original or Amended)]
  • August 18, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card (ADI)]
  • August 18, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Auto-Docket of Credit Card (ADI)]
  • August 18, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • August 18, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.