U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-mj-00188-1
  • Case Name: USA v. FOSTER
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 09, 2022: [Notice of Error]
  • November 09, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 03, 2022: [Terminate Merged Defendant]
October, 2022
  • October 21, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • October 21, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 20, 2022: [Continue ]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • September 30, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 28, 2022: [Continue ]
  • September 16, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 14, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 07, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 06, 2022: [Protective Order]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • August 31, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 29, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 26, 2022: [Protective Order ]
  • August 26, 2022: [Exclude]
  • August 26, 2022: [Continue ]
  • August 25, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • August 25, 2022: [.Order]
  • August 25, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • August 25, 2022: [Order on Motion for Temporary Detention]
  • August 25, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 25, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 25, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • August 25, 2022: [Temporary Detention ]
  • August 25, 2022: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • August 25, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • August 25, 2022: [Memorandum in Support of Pretrial Detention]
  • August 18, 2022: [Complaint (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.