U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-mj-00180-1
  • Case Name: USA v. LEYDEN et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 22, 2022: [Terminate Merged Defendant]
  • September 20, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • September 13, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • September 08, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • September 01, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 31, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 31, 2022: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • August 31, 2022: [Speedy Trial ]
  • August 25, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 25, 2022: [.Order]
  • August 25, 2022: [Rule 5 (c)(3) Documents Received]
  • August 23, 2022: [Case Unsealed]
  • August 23, 2022: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • August 23, 2022: [Arrest - Other District ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.