U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-mj-00167-1
  • Case Name: USA v. HORVATH
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 19, 2022: [Terminate Merged Defendant]
September, 2022
  • September 06, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • September 01, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • September 01, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 01, 2022: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • September 01, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 01, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • September 01, 2022: [Speedy Trial ]
  • September 01, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
August, 2022
  • August 26, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 26, 2022: [.Order]
  • August 23, 2022: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • August 23, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • August 23, 2022: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.