U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 22-00146-
  • Case Name: Got Your Back Chiropractic, P.C.
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 16, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [Order]
  • November 15, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [Approve Compromise Under FRBP 9019]
  • November 11, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • November 09, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [Hearing - Held (BK)]
  • November 09, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [Employ]
  • November 09, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [Exhibit]
  • November 08, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [Support Document]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [Objection]
  • October 23, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • October 21, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [Deficiency Letter - Pleading(s)/Document(s)]
  • October 21, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [Approve Compromise Under FRBP 9019]
  • October 18, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [Employ]
September, 2022
  • September 23, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor (Original or Amended)]
  • September 15, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • September 13, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [Deficiency Letter - Pleading(s)/Document(s)]
  • September 12, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [Employ]
  • September 09, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [Statement of Financial Affairs (Original or Amended)]
  • September 09, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [Schedules A/B-J]
  • September 06, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [Extend Deadline to File Schedules]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [Appearance (Attorney)]
  • August 26, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • August 25, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - First Meeting of Creditors]
  • August 25, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • August 25, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [Employ]
  • August 24, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [Notice - Possible Dividends]
  • August 24, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [Chapter 7 Notice of Possible Dividend - Asset Designation]
  • August 23, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [Deficiency Letter - Pleading(s)/Document(s)]
  • August 23, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [First Meeting of Creditors - Notice Sent to BNC]
  • August 23, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [First Meeting of Creditors 7 (Business No Asset)]
  • August 23, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card (ADI)]
  • August 23, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.