U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-mj-00186-1
  • Case Name: USA v. SOBOTKA
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [Terminate Merged Defendant]
October, 2022
  • October 27, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • October 27, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 25, 2022: [Continue ]
  • October 19, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • August 30, 2022: [Protective Order ]
  • August 29, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • August 25, 2022: [.Order]
  • August 25, 2022: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody ]
  • August 25, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • August 25, 2022: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • August 25, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 25, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 25, 2022: [Speedy Trial ]
  • August 25, 2022: [Release from Custody ]
  • August 25, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • August 24, 2022: [Case Unsealed]
  • August 24, 2022: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • August 24, 2022: [Arrest - Other District ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.