U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00284-1
  • Case Name: USA v. BLAIZE
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 20, 2023: [Dismissal of Counts on Government Motion]
  • January 19, 2023: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Case]
  • January 18, 2023: [Dismiss Case]
  • January 03, 2023: [Continue ]
December, 2022
  • December 11, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • December 02, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 02, 2022: [Exclude]
November, 2022
  • November 17, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • November 16, 2022: [Continue ]
  • November 13, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release with Global Positioning System Monitoring]
  • November 13, 2022: [Bond Hearing]
  • November 13, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 13, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
September, 2022
  • September 19, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • September 07, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 30, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 24, 2022: [Indictment]
  • August 24, 2022: [Rule 21 - Transfer In]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.