U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 22-00148
  • Case Name: Fabio Alfonso Beggiato and Patricia Binosi Beggiato
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 23, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [Compensation]
  • December 08, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [Approve Compromise Under FRBP 9019]
  • December 08, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [Compensation]
November, 2022
  • November 17, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [Extend/Shorten Time]
  • November 16, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [Approve Compromise Under FRBP 9019]
  • November 16, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [Request to Withdraw Document]
  • November 16, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [Statement of Financial Affairs (Original or Amended)]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [Extend/Shorten Time]
  • October 31, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [Examination]
  • October 18, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [Turnover of Property]
September, 2022
  • September 12, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [Employ]
  • September 06, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
August, 2022
  • August 28, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • August 27, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - First Meeting of Creditors]
  • August 27, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • August 26, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [Notice - Possible Dividends]
  • August 25, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [Chapter 7 Notice of Possible Dividend - Asset Designation]
  • August 25, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [Employ]
  • August 25, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [Notice Of Requirement To File Certification About A Financial Management Course (Ch 7)]
  • August 25, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [First Meeting of Creditors - Notice Sent to BNC]
  • August 24, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [First Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
  • August 24, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card (ADI)]
  • August 24, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Auto-Docket of Credit Card (ADI)]
  • August 24, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • August 24, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [Statement of Your Social Security Numbers - Form 121 (Original or Amended)]
  • August 24, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [Chapter 7 Statements - Monthly Income (122A-1) / Exemption Presumption of Abuse (122A-1Supp)]
  • August 24, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [Certificate of Credit Counseling (Original or Amended)]
  • August 24, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • August 24, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Statement of Your Social Security Numbers - Form 121 (Original or Amended)]
  • August 24, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Chapter 7 Statements - Monthly Income (122A-1) / Exemption Presumption of Abuse (122A-1Supp)]
  • August 24, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling (Original or Amended)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.