U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00053-1
  • Case Name: USA v. SEALED
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 19, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Document ]
  • September 16, 2022: [Reply to Opposition]
  • September 16, 2022: [In Limine ]
  • September 12, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • September 12, 2022: [Amend/Correct]
  • September 12, 2022: [Notice of Error]
  • September 12, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Document ]
  • September 07, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • September 06, 2022: [.Order]
  • September 06, 2022: [Extension of Time to]
August, 2022
  • August 24, 2022: [Memorandum in Opposition]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.