U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 22-00149
  • Case Name: Tonya Sheria Bynum
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 13, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [Order To Close Case & Discharge Trustee - Ch 7 No Asset (Discharged)]
  • December 13, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [Close Bankruptcy Case]
  • December 01, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [Order Discharging Debtor(s)]
September, 2022
  • September 09, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [Personal Financial Managment Course]
August, 2022
  • August 27, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - First Meeting of Creditors]
  • August 27, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • August 25, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [Notice Of Requirement To File Certification About A Financial Management Course (Ch 7)]
  • August 25, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [First Meeting of Creditors - Notice Sent to BNC]
  • August 24, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [First Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
  • August 24, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card (ADI)]
  • August 24, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Auto-Docket of Credit Card (ADI)]
  • August 24, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [Chapter 7 Statements - Monthly Income (122A-1) / Exemption Presumption of Abuse (122A-1Supp)]
  • August 24, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [Certificate of Credit Counseling (Original or Amended)]
  • August 24, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [Employee Income Records / Payment Advices (Original or Amended)]
  • August 24, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Chapter 7 Statements - Monthly Income (122A-1) / Exemption Presumption of Abuse (122A-1Supp)]
  • August 24, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling (Original or Amended)]
  • August 24, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Employee Income Records / Payment Advices (Original or Amended)]
  • August 24, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • August 24, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [Statement of Your Social Security Numbers - Form 121 (Original or Amended)]
  • August 24, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • August 24, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Statement of Your Social Security Numbers - Form 121 (Original or Amended)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.