U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00286-1
  • Case Name: USA v. GAMARRA
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 18, 2023: [Statement of Reasons (DO NOT UNSEAL)]
  • January 18, 2023: [Judgment]
  • January 17, 2023: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
  • January 05, 2023: [Sentencing]
December, 2022
  • December 21, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • December 20, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
September, 2022
  • September 28, 2022: [Waiver of Trial by Jury]
  • September 28, 2022: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • September 28, 2022: [Statement of Offense]
  • September 28, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • September 26, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • September 26, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • September 26, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • September 26, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • September 26, 2022: [Referred for PSI Report]
  • September 16, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 15, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
August, 2022
  • August 25, 2022: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.