U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-mj-00195-1
  • Case Name: USA v. COPELAND
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • December 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • December 28, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 28, 2022: [Continue ]
  • December 28, 2022: [Exclude]
November, 2022
  • November 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • November 28, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 21, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • November 21, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
October, 2022
  • October 24, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • October 24, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 24, 2022: [Exclude]
  • October 22, 2022: [Continue ]
September, 2022
  • September 15, 2022: [Order on Motion for Disclosure ]
  • September 15, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 15, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • September 14, 2022: [Disclosure ]
  • September 14, 2022: [Protective Order ]
  • September 06, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • September 02, 2022: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • September 02, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 02, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • September 02, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • September 02, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 02, 2022: [Speedy Trial ]
  • September 02, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
August, 2022
  • August 29, 2022: [Rule 5 (c)(3) Documents Received]
  • August 29, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 29, 2022: [.Order]
  • August 25, 2022: [Case Unsealed]
  • August 25, 2022: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • August 25, 2022: [Arrest - Other District ]
  • August 24, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal Case]
  • August 24, 2022: [Seal Case]
  • August 24, 2022: [Complaint (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.