U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-mj-00194-1
  • Case Name: USA v. RUSSELL
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 22, 2022: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • November 22, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • November 22, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 22, 2022: [Notice of Proposed Order]
  • November 16, 2022: [Continue ]
  • November 16, 2022: [Exclude]
  • November 15, 2022: [Continue ]
September, 2022
  • September 19, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • September 14, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 13, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 13, 2022: [Order on Motion for Disclosure ]
  • September 13, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • September 12, 2022: [Disclosure ]
  • September 12, 2022: [Protective Order ]
  • September 06, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • September 01, 2022: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • September 01, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 01, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • September 01, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • September 01, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 01, 2022: [Speedy Trial ]
  • September 01, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 29, 2022: [Rule 5 (c)(3) Documents Received]
  • August 25, 2022: [Case Unsealed]
  • August 25, 2022: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • August 25, 2022: [Arrest - Other District ]
  • August 24, 2022: [.Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.