U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-mj-00189-1
  • Case Name: USA v. DILLARD
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [.Order]
  • November 30, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 28, 2022: [Notice of Proposed Order]
  • November 28, 2022: [Exclude]
  • November 28, 2022: [Continue ]
  • November 28, 2022: [Speedy Trial ]
  • November 23, 2022: [Stipulation]
  • November 10, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 04, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • November 01, 2022: [Payment of Fee- Pro Hac Vice Motion]
  • November 01, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
September, 2022
  • September 13, 2022: [Order on Motion for Disclosure ]
  • September 13, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • September 12, 2022: [Disclosure ]
  • September 09, 2022: [Protective Order ]
  • September 06, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • September 02, 2022: [.Order]
  • September 02, 2022: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • September 02, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 02, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 02, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • September 02, 2022: [Speedy Trial ]
August, 2022
  • August 29, 2022: [Rule 5 (c)(3) Documents Received]
  • August 29, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 25, 2022: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • August 25, 2022: [Case Unsealed]
  • August 25, 2022: [Arrest - Other District ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.