U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-mc-00080
  • Case Name: MANVILLE TRUST MATCHING CLAIMANTS v. ALDRICH PUMP LLC et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 04, 2022: [Reply to opposition to motion]
September, 2022
  • September 27, 2022: [Reply to opposition to motion]
  • September 27, 2022: [Response to motion]
  • September 15, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • September 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • September 14, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • September 13, 2022: [Response to motion]
  • September 13, 2022: [LCvR 26.1 Certificate of Disclosure - Corporate Affiliations/Financial Interests]
  • September 13, 2022: [Transfer Case]
  • September 08, 2022: [Sealed Document]
  • September 06, 2022: [.Order]
  • September 02, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
August, 2022
  • August 29, 2022: [Quash]
  • August 29, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • August 29, 2022: [Case Referred to Magistrate Judge]
  • August 28, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • August 26, 2022: [Filing Fee Received]
  • August 26, 2022: [Quash]
  • August 26, 2022: [Modify]
  • August 26, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • August 26, 2022: [Order on Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal]
  • August 26, 2022: [Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.