U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-mj-00183-1
  • Case Name: USA v. CAVANAUGH
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 15, 2022: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • November 15, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • November 15, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 10, 2022: [Continue ]
  • November 10, 2022: [Exclude]
  • November 04, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • November 04, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • November 03, 2022: [Protective Order ]
  • November 01, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
October, 2022
  • October 24, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
September, 2022
  • September 09, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • September 09, 2022: [.Order]
  • September 09, 2022: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • September 09, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 09, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • September 09, 2022: [Speedy Trial ]
August, 2022
  • August 30, 2022: [Rule 5 (c)(3) Documents Received]
  • August 26, 2022: [Case Unsealed]
  • August 26, 2022: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • August 26, 2022: [Arrest - Other District ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.