U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00275-1
  • Case Name: USA v. DUPREE
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 10, 2025: [Verdict Form ]
  • April 10, 2025: [Signature of Foreperson..... (STAYS SEALED)]
  • April 10, 2025: [Jury Notes ]
  • April 10, 2025: [Attorneys' Acknowledgment of Trial Exhibits]
  • April 10, 2025: [Exhibit]
  • April 10, 2025: [Exhibit List ]
  • April 02, 2025: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • March 21, 2025: [Status Report]
  • March 18, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 13, 2025: [Memorandum Opinion ]
  • March 13, 2025: [Order on Motion for Acquittal]
November, 2022
  • November 28, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
September, 2022
  • September 13, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • September 13, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • September 13, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 09, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
  • September 07, 2022: [Order on Motion for Disclosure ]
  • September 06, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 06, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
August, 2022
  • August 30, 2022: [.Order]
  • August 29, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • August 29, 2022: [Case Unsealed]
  • August 29, 2022: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • August 29, 2022: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • August 29, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 29, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • August 29, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • August 29, 2022: [.Order]
  • August 29, 2022: [Speedy Trial ]
  • August 29, 2022: [Unseal Case]
  • August 29, 2022: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • August 29, 2022: [Arrest ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.