U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00227-1
  • Case Name: USA v. BROWN-MURPHY
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 07, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • May 07, 2025: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • May 07, 2025: [Continue ]
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Order on Motion for Hearing ]
  • April 28, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 11, 2025: [Errata]
  • April 11, 2025: [Notice of Error]
  • April 10, 2025: [Hearing ]
March, 2025
  • March 11, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
January, 2023
  • January 03, 2023: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • January 03, 2023: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 03, 2023: [Exclude]
  • January 03, 2023: [Continue ]
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • November 29, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • November 29, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • November 29, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
August, 2022
  • August 29, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 29, 2022: [.Order]
  • August 29, 2022: [Order on Motion for Temporary Detention]
  • August 29, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • August 29, 2022: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • August 29, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 29, 2022: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • August 29, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 29, 2022: [Case Unsealed]
  • August 29, 2022: [Unseal Case]
  • August 29, 2022: [Speedy Trial ]
  • August 29, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • August 29, 2022: [Temporary Detention ]
  • August 29, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • August 29, 2022: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.