U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00287-2
  • Case Name: USA v. ZANDERS et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: [USCA Case Number]
  • April 22, 2025: [Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA]
  • April 22, 2025: [Statement of Reasons (DO NOT UNSEAL)]
  • April 22, 2025: [Judgment]
  • April 21, 2025: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • April 21, 2025: [Sentencing]
  • April 18, 2025: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • April 09, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • April 09, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 09, 2025: [Continue ]
February, 2025
  • February 28, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
November, 2024
  • November 01, 2024: [Statement of Offense]
January, 2023
  • January 23, 2023: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
November, 2022
  • November 28, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • November 28, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • November 22, 2022: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • November 22, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • November 21, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • November 21, 2022: [Order on Motion for Temporary Detention]
  • November 21, 2022: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • November 21, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 21, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • November 21, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • November 21, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Location Start]
  • November 21, 2022: [Speedy Trial ]
  • November 21, 2022: [Temporary Detention ]
  • November 21, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • November 18, 2022: [.Order]
  • November 18, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
October, 2022
  • October 11, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • October 11, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • October 06, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
  • September 29, 2022: [Protective Order ]
  • September 28, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • September 08, 2022: [Appeal of Magistrate Judge Decision to District Court - Magistrate Judge Case]
  • September 08, 2022: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • September 08, 2022: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • September 08, 2022: [Order on Motion for Review]
  • September 07, 2022: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody ]
  • September 07, 2022: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • September 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Commit Defendant to Custody of Attorney General]
  • September 07, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • September 07, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • September 07, 2022: [Speedy Trial ]
  • September 07, 2022: [Release from Custody ]
  • September 07, 2022: [Commit Defendant to Custody of Attorney General]
  • September 07, 2022: [.Order]
  • September 06, 2022: [Stay]
  • September 06, 2022: [Review]
  • September 06, 2022: [Memorandum in Opposition]
  • September 01, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 01, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • September 01, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Memorandum in Support of Pretrial Detention]
  • August 30, 2022: [.Order]
  • August 30, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • August 30, 2022: [Order on Motion for Temporary Detention]
  • August 30, 2022: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • August 30, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 30, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 30, 2022: [Case Unsealed]
  • August 30, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • August 30, 2022: [Temporary Detention ]
  • August 30, 2022: [Unseal Case]
  • August 30, 2022: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • August 30, 2022: [Arrest ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.