U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00285-1
  • Case Name: USA v. BRATJAN, JR
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 07, 2022: [Notice to Receiving District of Criminal Case Transfer]
  • October 07, 2022: [Transfer Out/Probationer]
September, 2022
  • September 15, 2022: [Statement of Reasons (DO NOT UNSEAL)]
  • September 15, 2022: [Judgment]
  • September 14, 2022: [Statement of Offense]
  • September 14, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • September 14, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • September 14, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • September 14, 2022: [Plea Agreement Hearing]
  • September 14, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • September 08, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • September 07, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
August, 2022
  • August 30, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • August 30, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • August 30, 2022: [.Order]
  • August 30, 2022: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.