U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-mj-00184-1
  • Case Name: USA v. COLE et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 03, 2023: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 03, 2023: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • January 03, 2023: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
December, 2022
  • December 30, 2022: [Continue ]
  • December 30, 2022: [Exclude]
  • December 09, 2022: [Order on Motion for Disclosure ]
  • December 08, 2022: [Disclosure ]
November, 2022
  • November 28, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • November 22, 2022: [Protective Order ]
  • November 02, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • October 31, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 31, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • October 28, 2022: [Exclude]
  • October 28, 2022: [Continue ]
  • October 24, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • October 21, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • October 21, 2022: [Notice of Error]
  • October 20, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • October 17, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 14, 2022: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel]
September, 2022
  • September 23, 2022: [Rule 5 (c)(3) Documents Received]
  • September 07, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 02, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • September 01, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • September 01, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Rule 5 (c)(3) Documents Received]
  • August 31, 2022: [.Order]
  • August 31, 2022: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • August 31, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 31, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 31, 2022: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • August 31, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • August 31, 2022: [Speedy Trial ]
  • August 31, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • August 31, 2022: [Unseal Case]
  • August 30, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 30, 2022: [Case Unsealed]
  • August 30, 2022: [Arrest - Other District ]
  • August 30, 2022: [Redacted Document]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.