U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 22-00153
  • Case Name: Telemaco C Vilchez-Duarte and Maureen Jullisa Vilchez
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Order To Close Case & Discharge Trustee - Ch 7 No Asset (Discharged)]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Close Bankruptcy Case]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - Ad Hoc With Funds]
December, 2022
  • December 22, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • December 20, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Notice - Possible Dividends]
  • December 19, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Chapter 7 Notice of Possible Dividend - Asset Designation]
  • December 16, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Trustee Services Rendered Pursuant to 330(e)]
  • December 11, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • December 09, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Order Discharging Debtor(s)]
  • December 08, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [First Meeting of Creditors Held]
November, 2022
  • November 24, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Schedule C]
  • November 23, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Personal Financial Managment Course]
September, 2022
  • September 29, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Employee Income Records / Payment Advices (Original or Amended)]
  • September 02, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [BNC Certificate of Mailing - First Meeting of Creditors]
  • September 02, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Notice Of Requirement To File Certification About A Financial Management Course (Ch 7)]
  • August 31, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [First Meeting of Creditors - Notice Sent to BNC]
  • August 30, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [First Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
  • August 30, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Auto-Docket of Credit Card (ADI)]
  • August 30, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Auto-Docket of Credit Card (ADI)]
  • August 30, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Certificate of Credit Counseling (Original or Amended)]
  • August 30, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling (Original or Amended)]
  • August 30, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • August 30, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Statement of Your Social Security Numbers - Form 121 (Original or Amended)]
  • August 30, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • August 30, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Statement of Your Social Security Numbers - Form 121 (Original or Amended)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.