U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 22-00156
  • Case Name: William A Davis, Jr.
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 13, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Close Bankruptcy Case]
  • January 13, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Order To Close Case & Discharge Trustee - Ch 7 No Asset (Discharged)]
December, 2022
  • December 22, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • December 20, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Order Discharging Debtor(s)]
November, 2022
  • November 16, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [13 Chapter 13 Trustee Final Report and Account]
October, 2022
  • October 20, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [First Meeting of Creditors Held]
  • October 20, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution]
  • October 19, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Certification About A Financial Management Course (Original or Amended)]
September, 2022
  • September 18, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • September 16, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Deficiency Letter - Pleading(s)/Document(s)]
  • September 15, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - First Meeting of Creditors]
  • September 15, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • September 13, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Notice Of Requirement To File Certification About A Financial Management Course (Ch 7)]
  • September 13, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [First Meeting of Creditors - Notice Sent to BNC]
  • September 13, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Order Converting Case From Ch 13 To Ch 7]
  • September 13, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor (Original or Amended)]
  • September 13, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor (Original or Amended)]
  • September 13, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Deficiency Letter - Pleading(s)/Document(s)]
  • September 13, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Deficiency Letter - Pleading(s)/Document(s)]
  • September 12, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Deficiency Letter - Pleading(s)/Document(s)]
  • September 10, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card (ADI)]
  • September 10, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Statement of Intent (Original or Amended)]
  • September 10, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Schedule J]
  • September 10, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Schedule I]
  • September 10, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Schedule E]
  • September 10, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Schedule D]
  • September 10, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Schedule C]
  • September 10, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Schedule B]
  • September 10, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Schedule A]
  • September 10, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor (Original or Amended)]
  • September 10, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Declaration]
  • September 10, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Amended Summary of Your Assets and Liabilities]
  • September 10, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Voluntary Conversion to Chapter 7]
  • September 08, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Objection to Confirmation of the Plan]
  • September 06, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • September 02, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - First Meeting of Creditors]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [First Meeting of Creditors - Notice Sent to BNC]
  • August 30, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [First Meeting of Creditors 13 (Auto Assigned)]
  • August 30, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Employee Income Records / Payment Advices (Original or Amended)]
  • August 30, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Employee Income Records / Payment Advices (Original or Amended)]
  • August 30, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Certificate of Credit Counseling (Original or Amended)]
  • August 30, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Certificate of Credit Counseling (Original or Amended)]
  • August 30, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card (ADI)]
  • August 30, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Auto-Docket of Credit Card (ADI)]
  • August 30, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
  • August 30, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Chapter 13 Plan]
  • August 30, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Statement of Your Social Security Numbers - Form 121 (Original or Amended)]
  • August 30, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Chapter 13 Statement of Your Current Monthly Income 122C-1 (Original or Amended)]
  • August 30, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
  • August 30, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Chapter 13 Plan]
  • August 30, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Statement of Your Social Security Numbers - Form 121 (Original or Amended)]
  • August 30, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Chapter 13 Statement of Your Current Monthly Income 122C-1 (Original or Amended)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.