U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-mj-00136-1
  • Case Name: USA v. MCFADDEN et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 10, 2022: [Terminate Merged Defendant]
October, 2022
  • October 03, 2022: [Order on Motion for Disclosure ]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • September 29, 2022: [Disclosure ]
  • September 29, 2022: [Protective Order ]
  • September 01, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 31, 2022: [.Order]
  • August 31, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 31, 2022: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • August 31, 2022: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody ]
  • August 31, 2022: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • August 31, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 31, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • August 31, 2022: [Speedy Trial ]
  • August 31, 2022: [Release from Custody ]
  • August 31, 2022: [Unseal Case]
  • August 31, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • August 31, 2022: [Case Unsealed]
  • August 31, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • August 31, 2022: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.