U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00288-1
  • Case Name: USA v. ROSENBOROUGH
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance by Assistant U.S. Attorney]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: [Re-entry Progress Hearing]
  • March 26, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
January, 2023
  • January 18, 2023: [Memorandum in Opposition]
  • January 12, 2023: [Continue ]
  • January 08, 2023: [Hearing ]
  • January 08, 2023: [Pretrial Memorandum]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • November 30, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 29, 2022: [Continue ]
  • November 13, 2022: [Status Conference]
September, 2022
  • September 23, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
  • September 22, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 21, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • September 21, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • September 09, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • September 09, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 09, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • September 08, 2022: [Protective Order ]
  • September 01, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [.Order]
  • August 31, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • August 31, 2022: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.