U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00291-1
  • Case Name: USA v. HENSON-TYREE
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 09, 2023: [Transcript]
December, 2022
  • December 12, 2022: [Transcript]
  • December 07, 2022: [Reply in Support]
  • December 06, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • December 02, 2022: [Reply in Support]
  • December 02, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
November, 2022
  • November 22, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document ]
  • November 22, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • November 18, 2022: [Leave to File Document ]
  • November 18, 2022: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
  • November 18, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Case]
  • November 17, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • November 17, 2022: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody ]
  • November 17, 2022: [Order on Motion to Commit Defendant to Custody of Attorney General]
  • November 17, 2022: [Dismiss Case]
  • November 17, 2022: [Suppress]
  • November 16, 2022: [Transcript]
  • November 15, 2022: [Supplement to any document]
  • November 14, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • November 14, 2022: [Release from Custody ]
  • November 14, 2022: [Commit Defendant to Custody of Attorney General]
  • November 13, 2022: [Response to (non-motion) Document]
  • November 11, 2022: [Memorandum in Support of Pretrial Detention]
  • November 09, 2022: [Dismiss Case]
  • November 09, 2022: [Convert Hearing]
  • November 08, 2022: [Revoke]
October, 2022
  • October 12, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • October 12, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • October 12, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • October 06, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • October 06, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • October 06, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 05, 2022: [Continue ]
September, 2022
  • September 09, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 08, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • September 08, 2022: [.Order]
  • September 07, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 07, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.