U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-mc-00084
  • Case Name: IN RE: FOURWORLD EVENT OPPORTUNITES, LP
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 11, 2023: [Reply to opposition to motion]
December, 2022
  • December 30, 2022: [Response to motion]
  • December 20, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • December 20, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • December 19, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • December 19, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • December 13, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • December 13, 2022: [Quash]
  • December 10, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
November, 2022
  • November 15, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
October, 2022
  • October 29, 2022: [Order on Motion for Issuance of Letters Rogatory]
September, 2022
  • September 07, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • September 06, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • September 06, 2022: [Notice of Related Case]
  • September 02, 2022: [LCvR 26.1 Certificate of Disclosure - Corporate Affiliations/Financial Interests]
  • September 02, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • September 02, 2022: [Payment of Fee- Pro Hac Vice Motion]
  • September 02, 2022: [Notice of QC]
  • September 02, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • August 31, 2022: [Filing Fee Received]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.