U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 22-00158-
  • Case Name: Tiffani Mundaray
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 03, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Receipt of Filing Fee (OTC auto)]
  • January 01, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
December, 2022
  • December 30, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Order Discharging Debtor(s)]
  • December 19, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution]
  • December 16, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Trustee Services Rendered Pursuant to 330(e)]
  • December 05, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Receipt of Filing Fee (OTC auto)]
  • December 01, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Receipt of Filing Fee (OTC auto)]
  • November 29, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Discharge Order to Show Cause (Case Admin)]
  • November 06, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • November 04, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Order To Show Cause Failure To Pay Installments]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Personal Financial Managment Course]
  • October 18, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Receipt of Filing Fee (OTC auto)]
September, 2022
  • September 04, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [BNC Certificate of Mailing - First Meeting of Creditors]
  • September 04, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • September 02, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Pay Filing Fees in Installments]
  • September 02, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Notice Of Requirement To File Certification About A Financial Management Course (Ch 7)]
  • September 02, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [First Meeting of Creditors - Notice Sent to BNC]
  • September 02, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
  • September 01, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Declaration About Individual Debtor's Schedules - Form 106Dec]
  • September 01, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Schedules A/B-J]
  • September 01, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Summary Assets and Liabilities]
  • September 01, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Employee Income Records / Payment Advices (Original or Amended)]
  • September 01, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Chapter 7 Statements - Monthly Income (122A-1) / Exemption Presumption of Abuse (122A-1Supp)]
  • September 01, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [List of Creditors and Mailing Matrix]
  • September 01, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Statement of Financial Affairs (Original or Amended)]
  • September 01, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Statement of Intent (Original or Amended)]
  • September 01, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Certificate of Credit Counseling (Original or Amended)]
  • September 01, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Statement of Your Social Security Numbers - Form 121 (Original or Amended)]
  • September 01, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Application to Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
  • September 01, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • September 01, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [First Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.