U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00293-1
  • Case Name: USA v. POWELL
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 05, 2023: [Waiver of Trial by Jury]
  • January 05, 2023: [Statement of Offense]
  • January 05, 2023: [Plea Agreement]
  • January 05, 2023: [Plea Agreement Hearing]
  • January 05, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
November, 2022
  • November 01, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
October, 2022
  • October 19, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
September, 2022
  • September 28, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • September 28, 2022: [Order on Motion for Disclosure ]
  • September 27, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 27, 2022: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • September 27, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • September 27, 2022: [Speedy Trial ]
  • September 27, 2022: [Disclosure ]
  • September 22, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
  • September 21, 2022: [Supplement to any document]
  • September 13, 2022: [Supplement to any document]
  • September 09, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • September 09, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • September 08, 2022: [.Order]
  • September 08, 2022: [Protective Order ]
  • September 08, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 08, 2022: [Order on Motion for Temporary Detention]
  • September 08, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 08, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • September 08, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • September 08, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • September 08, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 08, 2022: [Temporary Detention ]
  • September 08, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • September 08, 2022: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • September 08, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • September 07, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 07, 2022: [Memorandum in Support of Pretrial Detention]
  • September 01, 2022: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.