U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00290-1
  • Case Name: USA v. SORELLE
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 15, 2022: [Status Conference]
October, 2022
  • October 20, 2022: [Rule 5 (c)(3) Documents Received]
September, 2022
  • September 09, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • September 09, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • September 09, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 09, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • September 09, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • September 09, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 09, 2022: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • September 09, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 09, 2022: [.Order]
  • September 09, 2022: [Speedy Trial ]
  • September 09, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • September 09, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • September 08, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • September 01, 2022: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • September 01, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • September 01, 2022: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.