U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 22-00159-
  • Case Name: Philip Oscar Emiabata
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 13, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Close Bankruptcy Case]
  • December 13, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Order To Close Case & Discharge Trustee - Ch 13 (Dismissed)]
  • December 13, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Order To Pay Filing Fee in Full]
November, 2022
  • November 11, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [13 Chapter 13 Trustee Final Report and Account]
September, 2022
  • September 15, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • September 13, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Order Dismiss Case]
  • September 12, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Deficiency Letter - Pleading(s)/Document(s)]
  • September 12, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [eNoticing Request Form]
  • September 12, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Chapter 13 Plan]
  • September 12, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Certificate of Credit Counseling (Original or Amended)]
  • September 07, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Receipt of Filing Fee (OTC auto)]
  • September 04, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - First Meeting of Creditors]
  • September 04, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • September 02, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Pay Filing Fees in Installments]
  • September 02, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Deficiency Letter - Pleading(s)/Document(s)]
  • September 02, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [First Meeting of Creditors - Notice Sent to BNC]
  • September 02, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Order To File Amended Certificate Of Credit Counseling Or Show Cause]
  • September 02, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
  • September 01, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Declaration by BPP - Form 119]
  • September 01, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Certificate of Service Re: Amendment To Matrix (LBR 1009-2(e))]
  • September 01, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Motion to Approve Trial Loan Modification Agreement]
  • September 01, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Chapter 13 Statement of Your Current Monthly Income 122C-1 (Original or Amended)]
  • September 01, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Statement of Financial Affairs (Original or Amended)]
  • September 01, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Schedule J-2]
  • September 01, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Declaration About Individual Debtor's Schedules - Form 106Dec]
  • September 01, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Schedules A/B-J]
  • September 01, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Summary Assets and Liabilities]
  • September 01, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Certificate of Credit Counseling (Original or Amended)]
  • September 01, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [List of Creditors and Mailing Matrix]
  • September 01, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Statement of Your Social Security Numbers - Form 121 (Original or Amended)]
  • September 01, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Application to Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
  • September 01, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
  • September 01, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [First Meeting of Creditors 13 (Auto Assigned)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.