U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00292-1
  • Case Name: USA v. GREEN
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 20, 2022: [Bond Set/Reset]
  • October 20, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Case]
  • October 20, 2022: [Dismiss Case]
  • October 13, 2022: [Status Conference]
September, 2022
  • September 29, 2022: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • September 27, 2022: [Order]
  • September 21, 2022: [Exclude]
  • September 19, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • September 19, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 19, 2022: [Continue ]
  • September 15, 2022: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • September 09, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 09, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 06, 2022: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody ]
  • September 06, 2022: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • September 06, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • September 06, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • September 06, 2022: [Order on Motion to Commit Defendant to Custody of Attorney General]
  • September 06, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • September 06, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 06, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • September 06, 2022: [Speedy Trial ]
  • September 06, 2022: [Release from Custody ]
  • September 06, 2022: [Commit Defendant to Custody of Attorney General]
  • September 02, 2022: [Indictment]
  • September 01, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.