U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 22-00160-
  • Case Name: Sandra Rodriguez Ibarra
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 09, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Notice of Appearance (Add Party to Matrix)]
December, 2022
  • December 19, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution]
  • December 16, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Trustee Services Rendered Pursuant to 330(e)]
November, 2022
  • November 10, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • November 10, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • November 08, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Order Discharging Debtor(s)]
  • November 08, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Discharge Order to Show Cause (Case Admin)]
  • November 03, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • November 01, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Personal Financial Managment Course]
  • November 01, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Order To Show Cause]
September, 2022
  • September 08, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [BNC Certificate of Mailing - First Meeting of Creditors]
  • September 06, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [First Meeting of Creditors - Notice Sent to BNC]
  • September 05, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
  • September 02, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Set First Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset]
  • September 02, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Transfer Case (bk)]
  • September 01, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Change Venue/Inter-district Transfer - Bankruptcy]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.